Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/07/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/22/2004
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/05/2004
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/05/2004
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/07/2004
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/30/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/30/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/30/2004