Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/06/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/24/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/24/2003