Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/12/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/12/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/12/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/12/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/12/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 02/12/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 02/12/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 02/12/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/27/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/26/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/26/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/26/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/31/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 03/31/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/31/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/31/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 04/11/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/14/2003

Show cosponsors who withdrew