Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/11/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/10/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/10/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/10/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/10/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/10/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/10/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/31/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/07/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/09/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/09/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/02/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/17/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/09/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 11/04/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/11/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/21/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/21/2004
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/07/2004