Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/04/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/04/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/03/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/03/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/09/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/09/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/09/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/09/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/09/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/11/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 04/11/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/29/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/29/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/29/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/06/2003
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/06/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/13/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/13/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/04/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/04/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/11/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/11/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/11/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/17/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/17/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/17/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/19/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/24/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 06/25/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/08/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/09/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/10/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/15/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/25/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/03/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/10/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/10/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/10/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/17/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/02/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/02/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/02/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/28/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/28/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/08/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/20/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/20/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/04/2004
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/10/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/31/2004
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/06/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/18/2004