Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/13/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/13/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/27/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/05/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/26/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/26/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/07/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/15/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/02/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/02/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/02/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/02/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/02/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/30/2003