Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/07/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/19/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/21/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/21/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/03/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/03/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/18/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/18/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/18/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/18/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/18/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/08/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/04/2003