Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/11/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/26/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/26/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/18/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/20/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/11/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/15/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/25/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/21/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/25/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 09/10/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/29/2003