Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/27/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/11/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/13/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/13/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/25/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/26/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/03/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/09/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/09/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/13/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/20/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/20/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/22/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/04/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/09/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/12/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/16/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/17/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/23/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/08/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/08/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/03/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/03/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/23/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/30/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/20/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/20/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 10/21/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/29/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/29/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/29/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/04/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/07/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 11/07/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/07/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 11/19/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/19/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/19/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/21/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/21/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/08/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/08/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/08/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 01/20/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/20/2004
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 01/20/2004
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/20/2004
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/20/2004
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/28/2004
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/28/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/25/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/09/2004
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/09/2004
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/17/2004
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/17/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/17/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/25/2004
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/01/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/22/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/22/2004
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/04/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/06/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/13/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/18/2004
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/18/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/22/2004
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/09/2004
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/21/2004
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/17/2004