Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/02/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/02/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/02/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/02/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/11/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/11/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 04/30/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 04/30/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/30/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/30/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/30/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/30/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/09/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/09/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/09/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/11/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/17/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/24/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/14/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/28/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/06/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/20/2004
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/27/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 03/03/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/03/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/17/2004
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/20/2004
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/28/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/28/2004
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/06/2004
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/12/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/19/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/17/2004
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/22/2004