Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/13/2003
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/13/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 02/27/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/27/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/27/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/27/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/27/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/11/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/11/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/11/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/11/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/11/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/11/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/11/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/11/2003
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/11/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/11/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/11/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/11/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/18/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/03/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/13/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/22/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/09/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/09/2003