Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/27/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/27/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/27/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/27/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/04/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/04/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/04/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/04/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/04/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/04/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/04/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/04/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/25/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/25/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/25/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/11/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/11/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/11/2003