Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/06/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/11/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/19/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/19/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/26/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/08/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/08/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/10/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/10/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/07/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/07/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/07/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/20/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 06/11/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/03/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/16/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/25/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/30/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/30/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/30/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/30/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/21/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/21/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/21/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/21/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/11/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/30/2004
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 04/28/2004
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 09/28/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/04/2004