Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 07/08/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/22/2004