Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/18/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/18/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/18/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/18/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/18/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/18/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/18/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/25/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/25/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/09/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/09/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/09/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/09/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/09/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/10/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/10/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/10/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/10/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/10/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/29/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/29/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/19/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/04/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/04/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/23/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/23/2003