Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/05/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/05/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/05/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/05/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/05/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/12/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/12/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/12/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/12/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/14/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/10/2004
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/10/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/10/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/10/2004
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/25/2004
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/25/2004