Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 02/26/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/04/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/04/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/04/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/04/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/05/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/05/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/06/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/06/2003
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/06/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/11/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 03/11/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/11/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/11/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/11/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/11/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/12/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/12/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/12/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/13/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/18/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/18/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/20/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/20/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/20/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/20/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/25/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 03/25/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/25/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/25/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/26/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/26/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/26/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/27/2003