Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/25/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/18/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/22/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/05/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/04/2004