Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/04/2003
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/04/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/04/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/04/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/04/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 04/29/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/29/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/24/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/24/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/15/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/15/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/15/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/15/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 10/08/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/28/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/06/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/18/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/08/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/08/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/08/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/27/2004
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/12/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/12/2004
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/12/2004
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/12/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/12/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/12/2004
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/12/2004
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/12/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/05/2004
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/05/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/05/2004