Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/12/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/26/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/26/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 02/26/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/26/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/26/2003
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/26/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 03/04/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/04/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/04/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/04/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/04/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/12/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27] 03/12/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/12/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/12/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/12/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/12/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/12/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/12/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/12/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/12/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/24/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/24/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/24/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/24/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/24/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/24/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/24/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/24/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/03/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/03/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/03/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/29/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/29/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/29/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/29/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/09/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/09/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/22/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/22/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/22/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/05/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/05/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/05/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/12/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 06/12/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/12/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/12/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/19/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/08/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 07/08/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/08/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/10/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/10/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/18/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/18/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/24/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/24/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/24/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/24/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/04/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/17/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/30/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/30/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/08/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/08/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/15/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/15/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/15/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/15/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/15/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/17/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/17/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 10/28/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/28/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/05/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/17/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/17/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/17/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/21/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/21/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/27/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/27/2004
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/06/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/09/2004
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/09/2004
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/09/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/23/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/25/2004
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/25/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/01/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/20/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/17/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 05/19/2004
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/19/2004
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/01/2004
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/01/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/01/2004
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/04/2004
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/08/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/2004
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/23/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/23/2004
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/25/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/07/2004
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/07/2004
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/14/2004
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/14/2004
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 09/28/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/28/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/06/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/16/2004
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/06/2004