Committees: H.R.743 — 108th Congress (2003-2004)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means02/12/2003 Referred to
03/13/2003 Markup by
03/24/2003 Reported by H. Rept. 108-46
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security02/19/2003 Referred to
02/27/2003 Hearings by
Senate Finance04/03/2003 Referred to
09/17/2003 Markup by
10/29/2003 Reported by S. Rept. 108-176