Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/05/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/05/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/01/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/07/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/07/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/07/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/15/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/02/2003
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/02/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/02/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/02/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/02/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/10/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/10/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/15/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/22/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/23/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/05/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/10/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/10/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/17/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/16/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/06/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/18/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/21/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/20/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2004
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/03/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/18/2004
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/18/2004
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 03/31/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/21/2004
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/21/2004
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/04/2004
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/04/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/04/2004
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/12/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/20/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/08/2004
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/25/2004
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2004
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/22/2004