Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/12/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/12/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/12/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/27/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/27/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/15/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/04/2003