Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/05/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/27/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/08/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 04/10/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/15/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/04/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/08/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/08/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/15/2004
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/15/2004
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/21/2004
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/16/2004