Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/04/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 06/02/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003