Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/26/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/26/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/26/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 02/26/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/26/2003
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/26/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 02/26/2003
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 02/26/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/27/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/04/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/04/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 03/06/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/18/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/18/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/18/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/25/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/25/2003