Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/26/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/26/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/26/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 02/27/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/06/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/11/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/11/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/11/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/18/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/25/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/25/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/26/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/27/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/31/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/09/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/29/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 05/06/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/06/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/28/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/28/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/11/2004
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/26/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/26/2004