There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Full Expensing for Economic Growth Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to expand bonus depreciation to expensing for 18 months.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/13/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
02/13/2003Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/04/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/19/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/19/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/27/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/03/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/30/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/22/2004

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means02/13/2003 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.771.


Subjects (17)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.771. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2003)

Full Expensing for Economic Growth Act of 2003 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code with respect to the special first-year allowance for certain property acquired after September 10, 2001 and before September 11, 2004, to increase such allowance to 100 percent for 18 months from the date of enactment of this Act, if there was no written binding contract in effect before such date, for: (1) the acquisition of such property; or (2) in the case of property manufactured, constructed, or produced for the taxpayer's own use, for the manufacture, construction, or production of such property.