Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/25/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/27/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/27/2003
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/06/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/09/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/09/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/16/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/07/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/13/2004
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/13/2004
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/13/2004
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/25/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/15/2004