There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Water Quality Investment Act of 2003

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to authorize appropriations for sewer overflow control grants.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/13/2004Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-675.
02/13/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
09/13/2004Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/13/2004Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-675.
07/21/2004Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/21/2004Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/15/2004Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
07/15/2004Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
07/08/2004Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment
02/14/2003Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/13/2003Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2003Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/13/2003 Referred to
07/21/2004 Markup by
09/13/2004 Reported by H. Rept. 108-675
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment02/14/2003 Referred to
07/08/2004 Hearings by
07/15/2004 Markup by
07/15/2004 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.784. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (09/13/2004)

Amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to require projects receiving sewer overflow control grant assistance to be carried out subject to the requirements applicable to projects receiving assistance from State water pollution control revolving funds, except to the extent that the Governor of the State in which the project is located determines that a revolving fund requirement is inconsistent with the purposes of the sewer overflow control grant program.

Reauthorizes appropriations for sewer overflow control grants through FY 2010.

Modifies grant funding allocation provisions to reflect new dates of authorization and reauthorized amounts. Eliminates the set-aside for the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to make direct grants to municipalities and municipal entities during the second year of authorization.

Establishes a December 31, 2008, deadline for the Administrator's report to Congress on recommended funding levels for sewer overflow control grants.