Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/26/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 02/26/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/26/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/27/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/12/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/18/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/18/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/25/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/31/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/01/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/03/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/03/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/03/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/03/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/09/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/09/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/09/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/29/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/08/2003
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/08/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/08/2003
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/08/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/08/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/08/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/09/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/13/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/13/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/19/2003
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/21/2003
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/21/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/02/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/02/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/02/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/10/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/10/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/10/2003
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 06/11/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/16/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/16/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/18/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/18/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/24/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2003
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/24/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/25/2003
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/08/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/08/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/15/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/15/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/24/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/24/2003
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/04/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/04/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/04/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/17/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/17/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/23/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/23/2003
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/07/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/16/2003
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/16/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/21/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/28/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/30/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/05/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/05/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 11/18/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/18/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/08/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 01/27/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 01/27/2004
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/27/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/27/2004
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 02/26/2004
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/26/2004
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/26/2004
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/24/2004
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/02/2004
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 04/27/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/27/2004
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/27/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/02/2004
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/08/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2004
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/21/2004
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/05/2004
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/07/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/09/2004
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/09/2004