Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 02/27/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/27/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/27/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/27/2003
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/27/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/04/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/04/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/04/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/06/2003
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/19/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/20/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/25/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/25/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/01/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/03/2003
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 04/09/2003
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2003
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-29] 04/29/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/06/2003
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/08/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/08/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/19/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/24/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/16/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/08/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/05/2004
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/15/2004
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/16/2004