Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/25/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/25/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/26/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/26/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/01/2003