Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/25/2003
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/25/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/26/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/31/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/10/2003