Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/06/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/25/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/27/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/27/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/27/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/01/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/01/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/07/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/07/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/08/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/29/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/29/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/09/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/09/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/09/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/12/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/26/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/26/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/26/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/08/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/14/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/14/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/18/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/18/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/24/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/03/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/03/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/03/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/25/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/30/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/08/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/17/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/17/2003
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/21/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/29/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/29/2003
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/29/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 11/06/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/14/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/25/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 02/04/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/30/2004
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/22/2004
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/22/2004
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 04/28/2004
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/12/2004
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/19/2004
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/19/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/08/2004
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/14/2004