Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-27]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/25/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/25/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/25/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/06/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/06/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/06/2003
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/13/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/13/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/13/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/13/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/13/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/13/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/13/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/13/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/18/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/18/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/18/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/18/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/18/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/18/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/18/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/18/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/18/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/18/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/18/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/20/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/20/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/20/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/27/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/27/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/27/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/27/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/27/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/27/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/27/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/03/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/03/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/03/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/10/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/10/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/10/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Ballance, Frank W., Jr. [D-NC-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/29/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/20/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/20/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 05/20/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/03/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/03/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/03/2003
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/18/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/18/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/18/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/19/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/19/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/17/2003
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/17/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/10/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/10/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/07/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/18/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/18/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/21/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/04/2004
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/10/2004
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/10/2004
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/10/2004
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/11/2004
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/11/2004
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/11/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/24/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/24/2004
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/24/2004
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/24/2004
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/24/2004
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/24/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/24/2004
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/24/2004
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2004
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/26/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/02/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/09/2004
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/09/2004
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/16/2004
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/16/2004
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/17/2004
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/17/2004
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/18/2004
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [D-LA-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/23/2004
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/29/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/13/2004
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/20/2004
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/03/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/06/2004
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/20/2004
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/21/2004
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/21/2004
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/08/2004
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/08/2004
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/08/2004
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/28/2004
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/08/2004
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/08/2004
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 11/17/2004
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/17/2004
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/19/2004
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/19/2004