Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/25/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/04/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/19/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/19/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/26/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/01/2003
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/06/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/07/2003
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/07/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/08/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/08/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/2003
Rep. Janklow, William J. [R-SD-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/15/2003
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/19/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/19/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/19/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/19/2003
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/20/2003
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/20/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/21/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/02/2003
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/04/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/04/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/04/2003
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/05/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/05/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/10/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/10/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/10/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/19/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/23/2003
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/25/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/26/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/08/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/04/2003