Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/05/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2003
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/12/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/12/2003
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/12/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/2003
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/26/2004