Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/05/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/05/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/05/2003
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/05/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/12/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/25/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/25/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/25/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/25/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/01/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/01/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/25/2003