Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/25/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/25/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/05/2003
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/05/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/05/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/05/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/02/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/02/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/09/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Majette, Denise L. [D-GA-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/29/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/29/2003
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/19/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 07/08/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/08/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/10/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/10/2003
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/17/2003
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/24/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/05/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/05/2003
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/30/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/21/2003
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 01/21/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/22/2004
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/20/2004
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/15/2004
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/22/2004
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/28/2004
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/28/2004
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/28/2004
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/04/2004
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/17/2004