Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 02/27/2003
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/27/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/27/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/19/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 03/19/2003
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/19/2003
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/19/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/19/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/27/2003
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/27/2003
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/27/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/27/2003
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/03/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/03/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/03/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/03/2003
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/03/2003
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/03/2003
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 04/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/12/2003
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/12/2003
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/01/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/15/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/15/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/22/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/22/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/05/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/12/2003
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/12/2003
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/19/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/19/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2003
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/19/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/26/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/26/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/26/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/26/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/15/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/17/2003
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/15/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/29/2003
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/05/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/05/2003
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/07/2003
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 11/19/2003
Rep. Burns, Max [R-GA-12] 03/16/2004
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/06/2004
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/13/2004
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/14/2004
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/22/2004