Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/13/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/27/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/27/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/27/2003
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/27/2003
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/2003
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/27/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/27/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/27/2003
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/11/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/11/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/11/2003
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/11/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2003
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/11/2003
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/19/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/07/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/07/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/07/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/02/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/02/2003
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/03/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/17/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/17/2003