Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/13/2003
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/05/2003
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 06/05/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/05/2003
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/05/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/05/2003
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/05/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/16/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/16/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/16/2003
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/16/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/16/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 06/16/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/16/2003
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2003
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/25/2003
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/14/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/14/2003
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/14/2003
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/14/2003
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/24/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/24/2003
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/03/2003
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/03/2003
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/16/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/16/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/24/2003
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/24/2003
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/24/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/24/2003
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/24/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/30/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 09/30/2003
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/30/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/30/2003
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/30/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/07/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/07/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/07/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/07/2003
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/08/2003
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/21/2003
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/21/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/21/2003
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/29/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/29/2003
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/30/2003
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/05/2003
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/05/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/12/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/12/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/12/2003
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/12/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/12/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/12/2003
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/12/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/20/2003
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/20/2003
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/08/2003
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/08/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/21/2004
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/21/2004
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/21/2004
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/24/2004
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/22/2004
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/20/2004
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/03/2004
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/25/2004
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/15/2004
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/07/2004