There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Belarus Democracy Act of 2004

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Belarus Democracy Act of 2004

Short Titles as Introduced

Belarus Democracy Act of 2003

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Belarus Democracy Act of 2004

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the promotion of democracy, human rights, and rule of law in the Republic of Belarus and for the consolidation and strengthening of Belarus sovereignty and independence.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
10/20/2004Became Public Law No: 108-347. (TXT | PDF)
10/20/2004Signed by President.
10/12/2004Presented to President.
10/06/2004Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 10/7/2004 S10612-10613)
10/04/2004Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7989-7990)
02/13/2003Introduced in House

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
10/20/2004Became Public Law No: 108-347. (TXT | PDF)
10/20/2004Signed by President.
10/12/2004HousePresented to President.
10/06/2004SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/06/2004SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 10/7/2004 S10612-10613)
10/05/2004SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
10/04/2004-7:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/04/2004-7:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7989-7990)
10/04/2004-7:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 854.
10/04/2004-7:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7989-7992)
10/04/2004-7:36pmHouseMrs. Davis, Jo Ann moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
02/25/2004HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
06/24/2003HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1338)
05/09/2003HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E920)
04/03/2003HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on Europe
04/03/2003HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on Europe
04/03/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Europe.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
03/10/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/06/2003HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/13/2003HouseReferred to House Financial Services
02/13/2003HouseReferred to House Judiciary
02/13/2003HouseReferred to House International Relations
02/13/2003HouseReferred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
02/13/2003HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E241-242)
02/13/2003HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations02/13/2003 Referred to
02/25/2004 Markup by
House International Relations Subcommittee on Europe04/03/2003 Referred to
04/03/2003 Markup by
04/03/2003 Reported by
House Judiciary02/13/2003 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Border Security, and Claims03/06/2003 Referred to
House Financial Services02/13/2003 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology03/10/2003 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (95)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.854. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 108-347 (10/20/2004)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on October 4, 2004. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Belarus Democracy Act of 2004 - (Sec. 3) Authorizes the President to support primarily indigenous Belarusian groups that are committed to the support of democratic processes in various activities that may include: (1) observation of elections and the promotion of free and fair electoral processes, including the development of democratic political parties; (2) development of independent media supported by nonstate-controlled printing facilities; (3) support of human rights; and (4) establishment of international exchanges and advanced professional training programs for leaders and members of democratic forces that foster the growth of civil society. Authorizes FY 2005 and 2006 appropriations for such activities.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes FY 2005 and 2006 appropriations for indigenous-language radio broadcasting to Belarus.

(Sec. 5) Expresses the sense of Congress that specified U.S. and multilateral loan and financial sanctions (with humanitarian, agricultural, or medical exceptions) should apply to Belarus until the President certifies to the appropriate congressional committees that the Government of Belarus has made significant progress in meeting the following conditions: (1) release of individuals who have been jailed for political or religious beliefs; (2) withdrawal of politically motivated legal charges against all opposition figures and independent journalists; (3) accounting of the disappearances of opposition leaders and journalists, including Victor Gonchar, Anatoly Krasovsky, Yuri Zakharenka, and Dmitry Zavadsky, and the prosecution of responsible individuals; (4) cessation of harassment and repression against the independent media, independent trade unions, nongovernmental organizations, religious organizations, and the political opposition; and (5) implementation of free and fair presidential and parliamentary elections.

(Sec. 6) Expresses the sense of Congress that the President should seek a multilateral strategy, particularly with the countries of Europe, to further the purposes of this Act.

(Sec. 7) Directs the President to report with respect to: (1) weapons-related activities by Belarus; and (2) the personal wealth of Aleksander Lukashenka and other senior leadership.

(Sec. 8) Declares congressional policy: (1) respecting the persecution and disappearance of journalists and political opponents in Belarus; and (2) commending the democratic opposition in Belarus.

(Sec. 9) Defines specified terms.