Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/04/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/04/2003
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/06/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/12/2003
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/12/2003
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/19/2003
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/25/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/29/2003
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/29/2003
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/29/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 05/06/2003
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/25/2003
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/25/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 09/05/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/10/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/17/2003
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/17/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/17/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/23/2003
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/25/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2003
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/02/2003
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/02/2003
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/02/2003
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/04/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/04/2004
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/27/2004
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/21/2004
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/30/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/30/2004