Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/04/2003
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/04/2003
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/04/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/06/2003
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/06/2003
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/18/2003
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/19/2003
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/20/2003
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/25/2003
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/01/2003
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/03/2003
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/09/2003
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/10/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/10/2003
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/29/2003
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/30/2003
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/30/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/09/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/22/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/03/2003
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/03/2003
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/05/2003
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/11/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/17/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/23/2003
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/25/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/10/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/25/2003
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 02/04/2004
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 02/26/2004
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/26/2004
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/26/2004
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 03/02/2004
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/02/2004
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/10/2004
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/20/2004
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/06/2004