Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/04/2003
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/12/2003
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/13/2003
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/18/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/20/2003
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/20/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/26/2003
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/31/2003
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/31/2003
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/01/2003
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/01/2003
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/09/2003
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/09/2003
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/11/2003
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/11/2003
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/29/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/13/2003
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/19/2003
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/19/2003
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/12/2003
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/12/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/18/2003
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-8] 09/17/2003
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/17/2003
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 12/08/2003
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/23/2004
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/01/2004