Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/26/2003
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/26/2003
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/26/2003
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/26/2003
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/26/2003
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/26/2003
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/26/2003
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/01/2003
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2003
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/09/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/09/2003
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/09/2003
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/09/2003
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/15/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/15/2003
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/15/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/03/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/03/2003
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/2003
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/03/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/03/2003
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/03/2003
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/25/2003
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/07/2003
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/07/2003
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/17/2003
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/04/2003
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/04/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/04/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/04/2003
Rep. Bell, Chris [D-TX-25] 09/23/2003
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/08/2003
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/15/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/28/2004
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/15/2004