Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/13/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/18/2003
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/18/2003
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 03/20/2003
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/20/2003
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/25/2003
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/26/2003
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/31/2003
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/31/2003
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/02/2003
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/02/2003
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/02/2003
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/03/2003
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/08/2003
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/08/2003
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/11/2003
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/11/2003
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/11/2003
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/29/2003
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/13/2003
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/13/2003
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/21/2003
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/02/2003
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/02/2003
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/02/2003
Rep. Ryan, Timothy J. [D-OH-17] 06/10/2003
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/16/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/16/2003
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/18/2003
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/18/2003
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/18/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/19/2003
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/08/2003
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/08/2003
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/09/2003
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/25/2003
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/04/2004
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/04/2004
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/04/2004
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/21/2004
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/21/2004
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/21/2004
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/27/2004
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/27/2004
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/13/2004
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/22/2004
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/30/2004