Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/25/2003
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/25/2003
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/01/2003
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/01/2003
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/08/2003
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/08/2003
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/15/2003
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/21/2003
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/02/2003
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/23/2003
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/23/2003
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/30/2003
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/28/2004
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/25/2004
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/02/2004
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/02/2004
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/08/2004
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/06/2004